MA H3746 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to recall of elected officers in the town of Wenham. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to recall of elected officers in the town of Wenham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-12-13 | House | Enacted |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-09-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-09-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-09-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3934 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3746 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3746.pdf |