MA H3860 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the select board of the town of West Tisbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the West Tisbury Select Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25HouseAmended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
2021-10-25HouseRead third
2021-09-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-27HouseRules suspended
2021-09-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-09-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-10SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-07HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
H4222 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2022
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback