MA H2166 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to change the name of the board of selectmen in the town of Burlington to select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To change the name of the board of selectmen in the town of Burlington to select board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
2021-10-14SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-10-14HouseEnacted
2021-10-14SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2021-10-14SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-08-26SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-08-26SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-07-29SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-07-28HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-06-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended
2021-06-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-05-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
H4302 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4729 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback