MA S2513 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the select board of the town of Goshen. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the select board of the town of Goshen

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-10-18SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2021-10-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-09-21JointHearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-08-30HouseHouse concurred
2021-08-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
H298 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
H4302 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4682 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2875 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback