MA S2491 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the Town Administrator Special Act to change the name of the Hingham board of selectmen to the Hingham select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Town Administrator Special Act to change the name of the Hingham board of selectmen to the Hingham select board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-07HouseHouse concurred
2021-07-06SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
S2451 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2474 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3916 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2482 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3948 (Similar To) 2021-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2021
H3987 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, April 11, 2022

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback