MA H3917 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the board of selectmen to select board in the town of Westborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the board of selectmen in the town of Westborough

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20HouseAmended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
2021-12-20HouseAmendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
2021-12-20HouseRead third
2021-09-27HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-09-27HouseRules suspended
2021-09-27HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-09-23HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-01SenateSenate concurred
2021-06-28HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3918 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2474 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2706
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
S2513 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
H4302 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
H4729 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback