US SB133 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 118-92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 118-92.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the National Alzheimer's Project.
Title
NAPA Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-01 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 118-92. |
2024-10-01 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2024-09-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2024-09-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5576-5577) |
2024-09-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 133. |
2024-09-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5576-5577) |
2024-09-23 | House | Mr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-08-02 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-08-02 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5568-5569) |
2024-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.3201 Amendment SA 3201 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-07-30 | Senate | S.Amdt.3201 Amendment SA 3201 proposed by Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S5569) In the nature of a substitute. |
2024-07-30 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5568-5569) |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 182. |
2023-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S150-151) |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Related) 2024-05-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 438.