MA H3606 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the pooling of housing inventories by cities, towns and regional school districts for the purposes of calculating percentages of restricted low or moderate income housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regional school districts and chapter 40B housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1327 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S817 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S804 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1323 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S778 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
H187 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3979 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2421 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback