MA H187 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Community Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to zoning ordinances and by-laws and improving housing opportunities. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving housing opportunities and the Massachusetts economy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

H180 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1814 (Similar To) 2019-08-29 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1784 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1798 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222
S94 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S818 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1765 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3883 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3931 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2369 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback