MA H1323 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4975

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, a petition of Theodore C. Speliotis and Daniel Cahill that cities and towns adopting a housing linkage program be exempt from certain provisions of the regional planning law. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To exclude cities and towns that adopt a housing linkage program from certain provisions of chapter 40b

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4975
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H4975 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback