MA H3032 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring driver’s license suspension for persons convicted of possessing a controlled substance in an automobile with a minor present. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring driver’s license suspension for persons convicted of possessing a controlled substance in an automobile with a minor present

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4772
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1501 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3184 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3012 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
H3310 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3101 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S927 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2061 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
S1131 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1866 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
H3329 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback