MA S927 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to restoration of rights. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to restoration of rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S12 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S405 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1437 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1500 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H228 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1976 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback