MA S1976 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2552

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to public utilities that operate in public rights of way. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to municipal authority in public rights of way

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2552
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback