MA H228 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the performance of electrical work by single family homeowners. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to clarifying homeowners right to perform electrical work

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-06-18JointHearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2506 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1008 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H923 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4152
H2509 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S594 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1719 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2550
H922 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback