MA H3012 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2641

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the issuance of driver's licenses to certain persons unable to provide proof of lawful presence. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to work and family mobility

Sponsors

Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Michael Moran [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-21SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2641
2019-09-04JointHearing rescheduled to 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1598 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1627 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H153 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1171 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1481 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied H2176
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H2148 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2429 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2641 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback