MA S2311 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1063

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to fairness in worker’s compensation disfigurement benefits,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2311).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fairness in worker’s compensation disfigurement benefits

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-08-05SenateNew draft of S1063
2019-08-05SenateReported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S1063 (Replaces) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2311
H4006 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H4061 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2355 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H4097 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2348 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1548 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S1687 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback