MA S1131 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the expungement of convictions for marijuana possession. Cannabis Policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the expungement of convictions for marijuana possession

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy

Same As/Similar To

H1501 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3375 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3275 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H708 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S900 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2276 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback