CA AB2469 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8654.10 of, and to repeal Section 179.9 of, the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency Management Assistance Compact: California Wildfire Mitigation Financial Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 179.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8654.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |