FL H0975 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-243; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1600 (Ch. 2024-274), CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2024-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-243; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1600 (Ch. 2024-274), CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2024-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides qualifications for person seeking certification as person with lived experience; requires continuum of care lead agencies to submit certain information to DCF for purposes of background screening; expands certain background screening requirements to apply to all health care practitioners; revises licensure, registration, or certification requirements for acupuncturists; optometrists; pharmacists; dentists; midwives; speech-language pathologists & audiologists; nursing home administrators; occupational therapists; respiratory therapists; dietitian/nutritionists; practitioners of orthotics, prosthetics, or pedorthics; electrologists; clinical laboratory personnel; medical physicists; genetic counselors; opticians; physical therapists; psychologists & school psychologists; clinical social workers, marriage & family therapists, & mental health counselors.
Title
Background Screenings and Certifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#977 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#737 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#737 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Chapter No. 2024-243; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1600 (Ch. 2024-274), CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2024-15) | |
2024-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-06-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-07 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment 667080 Concur |
2024-03-07 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2024-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-06 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (667080) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substituted for SB 558 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment 583751 adopted |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | PCS added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2024-02-08 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-07 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-07 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-17 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-17 | House | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-12 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-12-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1008 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S558 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 975
H563 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
S798 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S1600 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-274, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 975 (Ch. 2024-243), CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2024-15)
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
S558 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 975
H563 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
S798 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
S1600 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-274, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 975 (Ch. 2024-243), CS/SB 7016 (Ch. 2024-15)
S7016 (Similar To) 2024-03-22 - Chapter No. 2024-15
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 6241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
457 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 358 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 914 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 0051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0438 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |