MA H3101 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Naughton of Clinton, a petition of Harold P. Naughton, Jr., that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be directed to collect contact information of license applicants for use in case of emergencies. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Massachusetts drivers license information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3070 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3184 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3012 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3102 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback