MA H1866 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5038

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the administration of controlled substances. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure safe medication administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-15HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5038
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2597 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H67 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1363 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1549 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1432 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H5038 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback