MA H3329 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to penalties for trafficking controlled substances in hidden compartments. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to hidden compartments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-05-08JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback