MA H3917 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5126

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for failure to load vehicles to prevent dropping on public ways. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce litter on the highways of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5126
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-06-24SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-20HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation
2019-05-29HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback