MA H3478 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to increasing penalties for restraining order violations. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing penalties for restraining order violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback