MA H359 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to increasing the penalties to motor vehicle dealers for certain sales of used police vehicles. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to used police cars sold at auction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H453 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback