MA H2955 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the fines and penalties for texting while driving. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to increasing the fines and penalties for texting and driving

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
2019-03-20JointHearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S908 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S852 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S714 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1298 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
S1064 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2140 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S710 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback