MA S908 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect the citizens of the Commonwealth from drunk drivers. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the citizens of the Commonwealth from drunk drivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S113 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H286
S1449 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3336 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3344 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback