MA S1064 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to enhanced enforcement of civil penalties. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to enhanced enforcement of civil penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass under (Joint Rule 10) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday October 27, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1358 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1386 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1358 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1386 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1064.pdf |