MA S24 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to end child marriage in Massachusetts. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To end child marriage in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-03-12JointHearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H1478 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S944 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback