MA S1017 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to social networking impersonation or harassment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to social networking impersonation or harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S908 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S852 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S714 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1298 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S24 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2294
S1064 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Recommitted to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S710 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1426 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback