MA H1488 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4601
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing penalties for hit and run with a recreational vehicle. The Judiciary.
Title
Increasing penalties for hit and runs with recreational vehicles in the commonwealth to be known as the James Ward Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4601 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1308 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4601 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1377 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1308 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4601 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1488.pdf |