MA H3184 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Wong of Saugus, a petition of Donald H. Wong and Shaunna L. O'Connell that the Registry of Motor Vehicles be directed to ensure the validity of operators’ licenses issued to residents with student visas. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student visas and drivers licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4772
2019-06-12JointHearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3070 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3012 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
H2968 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3101 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2061 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
S2105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3015 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3102 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback