MA S2061 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2641

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to work and family mobility. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to work and family mobility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-21SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2641
2019-09-04JointHearing rescheduled to 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-08-28JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3184 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3012 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2641
H3117 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2641 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback