MA H3117 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize international students with F-1 visas who have obtained a drivers permit to drive. Transportation.
Title
Relative to drivers licenses for international students
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Robinson [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] |
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3117 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3117.pdf |