MA H2760 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5055
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5055
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the penalties imposed for failure to provide complete information in public bids and offers. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the use of force accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5055 |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5055 (Replaced by) 2020-10-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1332 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1337 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1555 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3917 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5055 (Replaced by) 2020-10-22 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2760.pdf |