MA H1846 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a commission (including members of the General Court) to study the need to reduce salt and sugar content in meals served in restaurants, schools, and public spaces. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a commission to study the need to reduce salt and sugar content in meals served in restaurants, schools, and public spaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H876 (Similar To) 2019-10-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2741 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2962 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2026 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1861 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S1455 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H3303 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1223 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2446 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback