MA H124 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H913

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to ensuring continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the Department of Children and Families. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring continuous healthcare coverage for youth who have aged-out of the Department of Children and Families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31HouseAccompanied H913
2019-07-10HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-08HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H328 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H159 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H403 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H453 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3352 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3435 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3390 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3392 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S344 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3476 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H132 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S872 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3471 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2227 (Similar To) 2019-05-29 - House concurred
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H913 (Replaced by) 2019-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4012
H4013 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Adopted, see H4012

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback