MA H112 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing the Massachusetts foster care review office. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Massachusetts foster care review office

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H510 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H436 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H37 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2741 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2401 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H438 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
S485 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1673 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3303 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H3937 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Senate concurred
H3938 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Senate concurred
H3953 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Senate concurred
H3969 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback