MA H3851 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-11)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a task force to review and investigate water and ground contamination of per-and polyfluoroalkyl substances. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an interagency PFAS task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-06-03SenateSenate concurred
2019-05-30HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S253 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1832 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback