MA H1166 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a health safety net task force. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to establishing a health safety net task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H496 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H496 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1166.pdf |