MA H72 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Blais of Sunderland and Senator Comerford, a joint petition of Natalie M. Blais and Joanne M. Comerford for an investigation by a task force (including members of the General Court) to address the statewide impacts of the 2018-2019 federal government shutdown.
Title
Resolve establishing the Massachusetts Government Assistance task force to address the statewide impacts of the 2018-2019 federal government shutdown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | House | Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2019-01-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1874 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H1650 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S2021 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1874 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S971 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2169 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H1650 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S2170 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H72 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H72.pdf |