MA H403 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require training and preparation in the use of augmentative and alternative communication for students who are nonverbal or who have limited speech for certain educator licenses. Education.
Title
To improve augmentative and alternative communication opportunities for children with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4427 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S318 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2690
H493 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4427 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H493 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4427 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H403.pdf |