MA H913 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase consumer transparency regarding insurance provider networks. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase consumer transparency about insurance provider networks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31HouseNew draft substituted, see H4012
2019-07-31HouseRead second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
2019-07-31HouseRules suspended
2019-07-31HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
2019-07-31HouseReferred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
2019-07-31HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4012
2019-07-31HouseAccompanied by S2295, H124 and H1141
2019-07-01HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-06-06HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H124 (Replaces) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H1141 (Replaces) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Replaced by) 2019-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback