FL S1500 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring drivers to change lanes when approaching a road and bridge maintenance or construction vehicle displaying warning lights on the roadside; authorizing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to conduct compliance reviews for a specified purpose; authorizing the department to conduct investigations and examinations relating to violations of provisions relating to title certificates; prohibiting the Central Florida Expressway Authority from constructing any extensions, additions, or improvements to the Central Florida Expressway System in Lake County without prior consultation with, rather than consent of, the Secretary of Transportation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-03-02SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1502 (Related) 2021-03-12 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H57 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
H1359 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
S1194 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - In Messages
H1385 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
H1151 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1134
S1126 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - In Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3163026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3163045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3208225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3382276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34380Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34382Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34383Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34384Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34388Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343881Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343884Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34389Amended CodeSee Bill Text
348754Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback