FL S1134 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - In returning messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising regulations applicable to owners and drivers of commercial motor vehicles; revising the length of time within which an officer is authorized to give written notice requiring correction of an unduly hazardous operating condition; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, rather than the Department of Transportation, to establish and revise standards to ensure the safe operation of nonpublic sector buses; providing that vehicles that meet certain conditions are exempt from odometer disclosure after specified periods of time, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#123 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-13HouseAmendment 834443 adopted
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 1151
2021-04-09HouseAmendment 834443 filed
2021-04-08House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-08HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-07HouseIn Messages
2021-04-07SenateImmediately certified
2021-04-07SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-07SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-03-31SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/31/21, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-18SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-17SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2021-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-04SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2021-03-03SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Transportation; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1151 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1134
H1359 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/BillText/Filed/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Amendment/834443/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.pre.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.tr.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Analyses/2021s01134.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Vote/SenateVote_s01134__026.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1134/Vote/HouseVote_s01134__123.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback