FL H1151 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1134
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides requirements relating to owners & drivers of commercial motor vehicles & nonpublic sector buses, written notice requiring correction of unduly hazardous operating conditions, compliance reviews, civil penalties, odometer disclosure, return of license plates to DHSMV, denial of motor vehicle trip permits, human trafficking, & DHSMV investigations, examinations, subpoena authority, & rulemaking authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseLaid on Table, refer to SB 1134
2021-04-13HouseSubstituted SB 1134
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-26HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-26HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-24HouseCS Filed
2021-03-24HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1134 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - In returning messages
H1359 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
S1500 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31670Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
319225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback