FL H1359 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for information received by DHSMV as result of investigation or examination conducted pursuant to certain provisions; authorizes DHSMV to release such information under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#124 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-21SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-14HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-13HouseAmendment 739109 adopted
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-09HouseAmendment 739109 filed
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-30HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-30HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseFavorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseAdded to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-22HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1151 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1134
S1502 (Similar To) 2021-03-12 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1134 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - In returning messages
S1500 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Amendment/739109/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359b.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359c.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/h1359e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Analyses/2021h01359.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1359/Vote/HouseVote_h01359e1124.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback