FL S1502 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from public records requirements certain information received by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles as a result of investigations and examinations of private rebuilt inspection providers; exempting from public records requirements certain information received by the department as a result of investigations and examinations of persons suspected of violating or of having violated certain laws, rules, or orders relating to motor vehicle licenses; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-11SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-03-02SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1500 (Related) 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time
H1359 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3191414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320861Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback