FL S1194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
Hearing: Apr 15 @ 9:00 am in 412 Knott Building
Hearing: Apr 19 @ 10:00 am in 412 Knott Building
Hearing: Apr 20 @ 8:30 am in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain governmental entities may not prohibit certain vendors from responding to competitive solicitations of certain contractual services; prohibiting the Department of Transportation and contractors and subcontractors of the department from purchasing specified substances from a borrow pit unless specified conditions are satisfied; requiring contractors wishing to bid on certain contracts to first be certified by the Department of Transportation as qualified; exempting airports from certain restrictions regarding entities performing engineering and inspection services, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --If Received
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-30SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-30SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
2021-03-30SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-25SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-24SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-02-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H57 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
S1500 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - CS by Transportation read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28705705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3370262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback