FL H0267 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits local ballot initiative or referendum from restricting maritime commerce in seaports; provides certain actions are prohibited, void, & expressly preempted to state; prohibits local governments & their political subdivisions & special districts from restricting maritime commerce in seaport located in or adjoining an area of critical state concern with respect to federally authorized passenger cruise vessel; provides certain actions relating to such restrictions are prohibited, void, & expressly preempted to state; clarifies remaining authority of certain local entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Preemption of Seaport Regulations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied on Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-21House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
2021-04-21HouseCS Filed
2021-04-21HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-21HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-05HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-08HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-04HouseCS Filed
2021-03-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-02-03HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-01-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S426 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1194 (Similar To) 2021-04-28 - Message sent to senate

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/BillText/c3/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Amendment/571249/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Amendment/445437/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Amendment/526549/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Amendment/044373/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267c.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/267/Analyses/h0267e.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57341&IsPCB=0&BillId=70372
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59839&IsPCB=0&BillId=70372
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60634&IsPCB=0&BillId=70372

Bill Comments 750

feedback